U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00132-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fraylon, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 18, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 11, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 01, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.