U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cortez-Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • October 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 04, 2021: [Document]
  • August 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 04, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2021: [Proposed Order]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • July 08, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • July 08, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • July 08, 2021: [Indictment ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 03, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.