U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lumpkin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 21, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 14, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 08, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • November 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • October 28, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue Other]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 14, 2021: [Continue Other]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • July 09, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 09, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 09, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.