U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00045-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Powell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • February 16, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • January 27, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • December 10, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • December 02, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • October 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 18, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 18, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • October 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.