U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mcalpin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Judgment - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 17, 2025: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 03, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • June 02, 2022: [Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice - Out of State Counsel]
  • March 10, 2022: [Quash]
  • March 04, 2022: [Service by Publication]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • February 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • January 24, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • January 24, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • January 24, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • January 24, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • January 12, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 22, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 25, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.