U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fair et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • May 05, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • April 27, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • April 27, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • April 27, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • April 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • April 11, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 16, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 15, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • September 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • September 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 15, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • September 14, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 14, 2021: [Witness List]
  • September 13, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 11, 2021: [In Limine]
  • September 11, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • September 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 01, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • September 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Use Evidence - Government]
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 19, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 19, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue Other]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 23, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 21, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 11, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 11, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance, Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.