U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00037-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • November 03, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • May 19, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • May 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 09, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 09, 2022: [Sealed Order]
  • May 04, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • May 04, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • May 03, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • May 03, 2022: [Seal Document]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 27, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • April 06, 2022: [Continue Other]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 01, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 24, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 03, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 03, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 30, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 24, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 24, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 23, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 23, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 15, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 15, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 10, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 10, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 03, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 03, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • October 26, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 25, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • October 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • October 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 13, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Addendum To Violation Report (PreTrial)]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 02, 2021: [Bond]
  • August 02, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • August 02, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 29, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 28, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 12, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • July 09, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 16, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • June 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.