U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00046-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gross
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • August 10, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • August 05, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 05, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • July 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 19, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • July 12, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • July 11, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 02, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • January 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • November 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • November 17, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • November 17, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • November 08, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.