U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00047-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Warren et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Early Termination of Probation]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Service by Publication]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • November 10, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • November 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 25, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 10, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 29, 2022: [Order Setting Response Deadline]
  • June 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 27, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 15, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • May 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 25, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 23, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • May 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • May 04, 2022: [Travel]
  • May 02, 2022: [Travel]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 07, 2022: [Expedite]
  • March 07, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • March 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 04, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • March 02, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 01, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • February 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 25, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Hearing Held - Not Completed]
  • February 23, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 23, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • February 10, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue Other]
  • February 09, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • February 08, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2022: [Factual Basis]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 12, 2022: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue Other]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • October 19, 2021: [Bond]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Other]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 20, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • September 17, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • September 10, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 07, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • September 07, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • September 06, 2021: [Arrest]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 14, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • August 04, 2021: [Indictment]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 09, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 10, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.