U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stamper
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 02, 2021: [Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • September 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 21, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • September 21, 2021: [Sealed Document]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.