U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00058-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seymour
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • June 27, 2022: [Sealed Document]
  • June 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • June 16, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • June 07, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • June 07, 2022: [Sealed Document]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 24, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 11, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • February 10, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • December 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 21, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 09, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 14, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 14, 2021: [Continue Other]
July, 2021
  • July 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue Other]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 03, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.