U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00056-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Irby
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • October 12, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • October 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
  • September 16, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 21, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 08, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 04, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 31, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 15, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 21, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 20, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • July 19, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • July 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Bond]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 16, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • July 15, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 14, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 14, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 14, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2021: [Arrest]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.