U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Taylor
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 15, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Screening Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Vacate (2255)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Letter]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Service by Publication]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 14, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • August 11, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 11, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 11, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • August 11, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 11, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 11, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • July 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 28, 2021: [Factual Basis]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.