U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Payton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 03, 2022: [Sentencing]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • February 08, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 10, 2022: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • January 05, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Inquiry into Status of Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • October 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • October 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 30, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 30, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 30, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 13, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 13, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 28, 2021: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 28, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 03, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.