U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McDay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 24, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • March 23, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 21, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order modifying conditions of Release]
  • November 19, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
  • August 13, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 13, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 13, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 13, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 13, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 04, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 04, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice Regarding Passport]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 18, 2021: [Bond]
  • June 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 10, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 08, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.