U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00052-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Logan
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 21, 2025: [Prob12B Order Modifying Conditions/Term of Supervision]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • December 06, 2021: [Judgment]
  • December 02, 2021: [Sentencing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Service by Publication]
  • October 19, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 17, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue Other]
  • September 24, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 20, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Accepting Plea]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • August 20, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • August 20, 2021: [Factual Basis Certification]
  • August 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • August 20, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • August 20, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • August 16, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue Other]
June, 2021
  • June 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • June 14, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 10, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 10, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 10, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.