U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Frady
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Transcript - Appeal]
  • September 07, 2022: [Transcript Order Acknowledgment - Appeal]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Order - Other - USCA]
  • August 22, 2022: [Case Number - USCA]
  • August 18, 2022: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal to USCA]
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment - USCA]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 04, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • August 02, 2022: [Miscellaneous Filing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Letters of Recommendation/Support regarding Sentencing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 13, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order Accepting Plea]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • February 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • February 25, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • February 25, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • February 18, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • February 18, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Memorandum and Recommendations]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2021: [Memorandum and Recommendations]
  • October 20, 2021: [Transcript]
  • October 15, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • August 20, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • August 20, 2021: [Suppress]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 22, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 23, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 23, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 07, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.