U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Allen-Long
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • April 12, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • October 01, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 01, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea - Addendum]
  • October 01, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing Plea - Asheville]
  • September 28, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2021: [Factual Basis]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 18, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 25, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 25, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 25, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 25, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 04, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 02, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.