U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Armstead
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Document]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Document]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • April 05, 2022: [Sentencing ]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
  • November 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Amended Presentence Investigation Report]
  • October 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Docket Call]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 03, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 02, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.