U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harris
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 15, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 08, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 10, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 07, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Amended Penalty Sheet]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 02, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.