U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Langley et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • May 20, 2022: [Withdraw Document]
  • May 19, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 10, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • May 03, 2022: [Sentencing ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • April 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 26, 2022: [Seal ]
  • April 26, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • April 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • April 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • April 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • January 04, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 04, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 25, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 21, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 17, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 17, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.