U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice-other]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • July 29, 2022: [Transcript]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Document]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement Accepted ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 14, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • March 09, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 06, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 21, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.