U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Peremptory Challenges]
  • March 17, 2022: [Judgment of Acquittal]
  • March 17, 2022: [Unredacted Document]
  • March 17, 2022: [Jury Verdict ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Exhibit List ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Acquittal ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Acquittal ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Jury Trial ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [Jury Impaneled]
  • March 15, 2022: [Jury Seating Arrangement]
  • March 15, 2022: [Jury Selection]
  • March 15, 2022: [Voir Dire and Jury Trial]
  • March 15, 2022: [Witness List]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for evidence under Rule 404(b)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sequester]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine ]
  • March 09, 2022: [Pretrial Conference ]
  • March 07, 2022: [In Limine ]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 14, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice-other]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 17, 2022: [In Limine ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Sequester]
  • January 17, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 17, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • January 12, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 10, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • January 10, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions ]
  • January 10, 2022: [404(b) Evidence]
  • January 10, 2022: [Notice-other]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Letter]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Suggestion of Subsequent Authority]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 21, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 10, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 09, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • September 02, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Suppress ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 19, 2021: [Dismiss/Speedy Trial]
  • August 19, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 19, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Notice of Writ to Produce]
  • June 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Related Case]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.