U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00233-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sutton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 06, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • June 03, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 05, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 07, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • October 05, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • October 05, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • October 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • October 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Text Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • October 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [Application for Writ]
  • September 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.