U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00232-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jenkins
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 04, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Docket Call]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 07, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.