U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00231-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sasore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 20, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • August 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • June 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • May 11, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 12, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 25, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • October 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 20, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 30, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 28, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.