U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Durham
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
June, 2022
  • June 06, 2022: [Judgment ]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • May 19, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • May 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 07, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • February 22, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • February 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • February 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • February 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 07, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Leave to File Document ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Suppress ]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
  • October 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [USCA Judgment]
  • September 09, 2021: [USCA Order]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [USCA Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [USCA Case Number ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 17, 2021: [Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory]
  • August 12, 2021: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • August 12, 2021: [Transcript]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • August 02, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • July 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Hearings]
  • July 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 28, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 07, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 05, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 02, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.