U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00228-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property ]
  • November 15, 2021: [Sentencing ]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Forfeiture of Property ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 21, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 14, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 13, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • August 26, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 03, 2021: [Withdrawal of Motion]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Reconsideration ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 29, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • July 28, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 29, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.