U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00227-1
  • Case Name: USA v. King
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 20, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 20, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue ]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 24, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 23, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Continue Sentencing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 14, 2025: [Objection to PSI]
  • April 04, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 04, 2025: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2025: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • March 14, 2025: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 11, 2023: [Plea Agreement ]
  • January 11, 2023: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Arraignment ]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Plea Entered]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • December 23, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • November 21, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • November 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Notice to Counsel]
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 13, 2022: [Waiver of Interstate Agreement on Detainers]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • June 08, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing ]
  • June 07, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 06, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 03, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 03, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Text Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • June 03, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Arrest ]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • May 18, 2022: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • May 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 07, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 07, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.