U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00153-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Keller
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • March 01, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • February 11, 2022: [Seal]
  • February 11, 2022: [Sealed Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
  • February 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 09, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 18, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 18, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 18, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 18, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 18, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 16, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 08, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • June 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 07, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 07, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.