U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cr-00343-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 13, 2021: [Sentencing ]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • August 20, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • August 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • June 07, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.