U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hicks
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • November 22, 2022: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 22, 2022: [Detention]
  • November 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received ]
  • November 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • November 17, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 11, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.