U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00247-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harding
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 27, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 14, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • May 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 23, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 23, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 27, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 26, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 26, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.