U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • April 08, 2025: [Letter]
March, 2025
  • March 10, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice-other]
  • May 09, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • March 15, 2022: [Release from Custody ]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Sentencing ]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 12, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 08, 2021: [Document]
  • October 08, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 07, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Motion Hearing ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 26, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • July 26, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 25, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 23, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • July 23, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.