U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 11, 2025: [Response to Motion]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • August 15, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • May 13, 2022: [Transcript]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress ]
  • March 11, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
February, 2022
  • February 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 08, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
  • December 01, 2021: [Suppress ]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 26, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
September, 2021
  • September 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 25, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • August 25, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • August 22, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • August 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • August 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 12, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • August 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • August 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Detention]
  • August 11, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 11, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release/Probation Transfer]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.