U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00242-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Speight
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • January 20, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • January 17, 2022: [Sentencing Memorandum (NOT SEALED)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue Sentencing]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • September 08, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 05, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 06, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • June 17, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • June 16, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 16, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 15, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 15, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.