U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00241-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Whaley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • July 19, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • July 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • June 17, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 15, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing ]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Text Order]
  • January 31, 2022: [Waiver of Detention Hearing]
  • January 28, 2022: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • January 27, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 27, 2022: [Request for Discovery]
  • January 27, 2022: [Scheduling Order ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • January 26, 2022: [Initial Appearance ]
  • January 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.