U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Massey
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: [Document]
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Letter]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue ]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • September 26, 2022: [Transcript]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • August 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • August 15, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Motion Referred]
  • August 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • August 04, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 18, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • July 01, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • April 28, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • April 28, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • April 18, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • April 15, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • April 15, 2022: [Non-evidentiary Hearing]
  • April 15, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Document]
  • March 29, 2022: [SEALED Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Motion Hearing ]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [Seal Document]
  • March 10, 2022: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • February 18, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 18, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 19, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • November 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Notice of Waiver of Initial Appearance on Superseding Indictment]
  • October 14, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • October 14, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • October 14, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 20, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 16, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Show Cause Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 16, 2021: [Remark]
  • June 16, 2021: [Notice of Correction]
  • June 16, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order to Show Cause ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • June 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.