U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00040-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lapotsky
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Notice of Exhibit Disposal]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Criminal Order of Dismissal]
  • February 04, 2022: [Reply to Response ]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document ]
  • February 03, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
January, 2022
  • January 29, 2022: [Leave to File Document ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Response to Motion]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • December 13, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 13, 2021: [Certificate of Service ]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Deficiency]
  • December 13, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [PROPOSED SEALED Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 01, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Extension of Time]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • September 23, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • September 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 23, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • August 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [PETITION and ORDER for Action on Pretrial Release]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 02, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • August 02, 2021: [Extension of Time]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 25, 2021: [Extension of Time]
  • July 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 25, 2021: [Proposed Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Remark]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice-other]
  • July 09, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice to Counsel]
  • July 08, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Exhibit List ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • July 07, 2021: [Stay]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 01, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Issued ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Indictment ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Unredacted Document]
  • June 11, 2021: [Warrant Requested]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.