U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rucker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion to Show Cause re Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [SEALED Document]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 16, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • July 15, 2021: [Amended Motion for Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Finding Probable Cause]
  • July 09, 2021: [Preliminary Revocation Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Docket Call]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Docket Call]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 23, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 23, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • June 23, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 22, 2021: [SEALED Revocation of Supervised Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [Warrant Issued (USPO)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.