U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00230-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Diaz-Castellano
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • December 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • September 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • September 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order - Written Order Following Oral Order on Motion]
  • August 18, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • August 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Request for Discovery]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Waiver of Interstate Agreement on Detainers]
  • June 25, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 25, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 25, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23 ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.