U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00157-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • August 02, 2022: [Response to Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • June 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • April 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • December 15, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • November 09, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
August, 2021
  • August 11, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 22, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 15, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.