U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00156-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Locklear
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Vacate (2255)]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 23, 2025: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • March 27, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 27, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • January 12, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 11, 2023: [Sentencing]
  • January 08, 2023: [Sentencing Memorandum or Response]
August, 2022
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Other]
  • August 09, 2022: [Continue Other]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 26, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • November 12, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2021
  • September 16, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • September 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • September 10, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • September 10, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • September 10, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • September 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 09, 2021: [Summons Issued]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.