U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00155-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Willis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 15, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2025: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 11, 2025: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 11, 2025: [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings]
  • April 09, 2025: [Arrest]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 29, 2022: [Sentencing]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 13, 2021: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 07, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • September 07, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • June 21, 2021: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • June 21, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • June 21, 2021: [Plea Hearing]
  • June 21, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Plea Agreement]
  • June 14, 2021: [Factual Basis]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.