U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:20-cr-00121-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cooper et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion to Seal ]
  • October 09, 2024: [Seal ]
  • October 09, 2024: [PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit]
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice of Attorney Appearance Pursuant to 23-SO-6]
  • October 09, 2024: [Reduce Sentence - Amendment 821 - Criminal History Category]
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • January 03, 2023: [Request for Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • December 22, 2022: [Appoint Counsel ]
  • December 22, 2022: [Sentencing ]
  • December 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • December 06, 2022: [Proposed Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Failure to File Proposed Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Objection to PSI]
  • November 22, 2022: [Letter]
  • November 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
  • November 08, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • August 08, 2022: [Motion Submitted]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Dismiss ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Plea Agreement ]
  • June 16, 2022: [Arraignment ]
  • June 16, 2022: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • June 16, 2022: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 25, 2022: [Docket Call]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue Sentencing]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 03, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting/Resetting Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Dismiss ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Consent to Magistrate Arraignment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • October 14, 2021: [Release Status Report]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 11, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Text Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • July 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Motion Referred]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel - USA]
  • June 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Text Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention - Temporary]
  • June 22, 2021: [Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.