U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Eastern District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00251-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Loranger
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Agreed Order of Payment - USPO]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Letter]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judgment ]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order to Surrender]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 22, 2021: [Sentencing ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report - Final]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 13, 2021: [Objection to PSI]
  • September 10, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report -Draft]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Plea Agreement ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Waiver of Indictment ]
  • July 21, 2021: [Arraignment ]
  • July 21, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Plea Entered]
  • July 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Pretrial Services Report]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing ]
  • June 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 14, 2021: [Information - Felony]
  • June 14, 2021: [Penalty Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.