U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00042-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Deritis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Opinion - USCA]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Objection to Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 23, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Objections to PSR]
  • August 15, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [JERS Exhibits]
  • June 22, 2022: [Judge or Jury Notes]
  • June 22, 2022: [Jury Verdict]
  • June 21, 2022: [Jury Trial]
  • June 21, 2022: [Order Returning Trial Exhibits]
  • June 21, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • June 21, 2022: [Witness List]
  • June 21, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • June 16, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Verdict]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • June 14, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
  • June 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 13, 2022: [In Limine]
  • June 09, 2022: [Sealed Motion]
  • June 09, 2022: [Seal]
  • June 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 06, 2022: [Request for Notice of Alibi/Insanity Defense]
  • June 03, 2022: [Request for Reciprocal Discovery]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Transcript]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • December 20, 2021: [Addendum]
  • December 16, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Seal Document]
  • December 13, 2021: [Sealed Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 24, 2021: [Seal]
  • November 24, 2021: [Sealed Motion]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • September 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • July 08, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 08, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 08, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • July 08, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • July 02, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 02, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 02, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 02, 2021: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 02, 2021: [Arrest]
  • July 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
  • June 23, 2021: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.