U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00041-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • February 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Sentencing]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Presentence Investigation Report]
October, 2021
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • October 12, 2021: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • October 12, 2021: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • October 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 07, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • October 06, 2021: [Factual Basis]
August, 2021
  • August 28, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • August 23, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • August 19, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Community Defender]
  • August 19, 2021: [Initial Appearance and Arraignment]
  • August 19, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2021: [Arrest]
  • August 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.