U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Daniels
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • December 09, 2022: [Plea Hearing - Straight Up]
  • December 09, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice of Cancellation of Hearing]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Due Process Protection Act]
  • October 13, 2022: [Arraignment and Detention]
  • October 12, 2022: [Pretrial Report]
  • October 07, 2022: [CJA 20 - Appointment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Oral Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 07, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 07, 2022: [Case Reopened]
  • October 06, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Arrest]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.