U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Western District of North Carolina

north carolina Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00043-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonds
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment - Reason for Amendment]
  • January 13, 2023: [Amended Judgment]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal]
  • January 10, 2023: [Seal]
  • January 10, 2023: [Sealed Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time re: Other]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time re: Other]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Oral or Text-Only Order]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment - Statement of Reasons]
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 15, 2022: [Sentencing]
  • September 09, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Service by Publication]
  • May 22, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
April, 2022
  • April 04, 2022: [Judgment of Forfeiture]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of PSI Interview Preference]
  • April 04, 2022: [Acceptance of Guilty Plea]
  • April 04, 2022: [Plea Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 25, 2022: [Factual Basis]
  • March 25, 2022: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • November 29, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 04, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
  • October 01, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
September, 2021
  • September 25, 2021: [Memorandum in Support]
  • September 15, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • September 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Motion and M&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 07, 2021: [Response in Opposition]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Suppress]
  • August 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 24, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue Docket Call/Trial]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 24, 2021: [Standard Discovery Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 24, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 24, 2021: [Arraignment]
  • June 23, 2021: [Pretrial Report]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2021: [Arrest]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 15, 2021: [Warrant Issued]
  • June 15, 2021: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.